Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3226
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#755
|
Journal Page: 3225
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3225
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3225
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Bolton
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3104
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3104
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|