House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4596
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4595
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5200
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3414
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Williams
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|