House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|