House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 297 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 297 | |
House | 11/18/2008 | Filed |