E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4750
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1145
|
Journal Page: 4750
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4750
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4308
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|