E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4308 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2629 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 997 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#144 | Journal Page: 1174 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 701 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Filed |