Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB277 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R1097 KLA-D
 By: Zerwas H.B. No. 277


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the franchise tax and alternative revenue sources and
 spending priorities for this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as the Revenue Reform Act
 of 2009.
 SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2010, Section
 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $600,000
 [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per
 12-month period on which margin is based.
 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2011, Section
 171.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $1 million
 [$300,000] or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per
 12-month period on which margin is based.
 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 4. (a) The comptroller of public accounts shall
 conduct a comprehensive study that:
 (1) analyzes and compares:
 (A) the feasibility of implementing alternative
 methods to the franchise tax imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, by
 which revenue may be generated to address the needs of this state;
 and
 (B) the effectiveness of each of those methods in
 generating sufficient revenue to address those needs; and
 (2) prioritizes the revenue needs of this state and
 identifies potential reductions in expenditures by this state.
 (b) The comptroller of public accounts shall consider the
 funding priorities and requirements established by the Texas
 Constitution in prioritizing the revenue needs of this state as
 required by Subsection (a)(2) of this section.
 (c) The study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section
 must include an analysis and comparison of the following
 revenue-generating methods:
 (1) imposing a transaction tax in this state;
 (2) imposing a value-added tax in this state;
 (3) eliminating exemptions from the sales and use tax
 imposed under Chapter 151, Tax Code;
 (4) increasing the rate of the sales and use tax
 imposed under Chapter 151, Tax Code;
 (5) imposing the sales and use tax under Chapter 151,
 Tax Code, according to rate brackets, the applications of which
 vary according to the sales price of a taxable item;
 (6) imposing a business sales tax in this state in
 addition to the sales and use tax imposed under Chapter 151, Tax
 Code; and
 (7) any other method the comptroller considers
 potentially effective in addressing the revenue needs of this
 state.
 (d) Not later than November 1, 2010, the comptroller of
 public accounts shall submit a report to the legislature regarding
 the results of the study conducted under this section. The report
 must:
 (1) identify one or more revenue-generating methods
 the comptroller determines would be most effective in meeting the
 revenue needs of this state;
 (2) include a description of any legislation necessary
 to implement the methods identified under Subdivision (1) of this
 subsection; and
 (3) propose specific reductions in expenditures by
 this state and any legislation necessary to implement those
 reductions.
 SECTION 5. Effective January 1, 2014, Chapter 171, Tax
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.