E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6974
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1075
|
Journal Page: 5128
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1649
|
Journal Page: 6447
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6424
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2900
|
Journal Page: 6417
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4825
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4578
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5469
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5469
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5469
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#338
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1888
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Truitt
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/27/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|