Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2714 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2674 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2472 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#554 | Journal Page: 2471 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2471 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2471 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2421 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2421 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Filed |