Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|