Senate | 05/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2457 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#885 | Journal Page: 3740 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3740 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3740 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-Menendez | Journal Page: 3595 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 6:00 PM | Journal Page: 3590 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2674 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 706 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 706 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Filed |