Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2850 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R9767 TRH-F
 By: Farabee H.B. No. 2850


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to goals for renewable energy capacity derived from
 renewable energy sources other than sources using wind energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a goal [target] of 10,000 megawatts of installed
 renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. The cumulative installed
 renewable capacity in this state shall total 2,280 megawatts by
 January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, 4,264
 megawatts by January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1, 2013,
 and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the renewable energy
 technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this
 subsection after September 1, 2005, the commission shall establish
 a goal [target] of having at least 3,000 [500] megawatts of capacity
 from a renewable energy technology other than a source using wind
 energy.
 (o) The commission may establish an alternative compliance
 payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
 section. The commission may establish a separate alternative
 compliance payment for the goal of 3,000 [500] megawatts of
 capacity from renewable energy technologies other than wind energy.
 The alternative compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase
 requirement that could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit
 from wind energy may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater
 than $20 per credit. Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative
 compliance payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per
 credit. In implementing this subsection, the commission shall
 consider:
 (1) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 (2) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 (3) the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 (4) any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate increases.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.