E
|
05/30/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 710
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|