House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4668
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5246
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5246
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5246
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5130
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|