House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Filed |