Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2458 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3738 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#883 | Journal Page: 3737 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amended | 3-Gattis | Journal Page: 3736 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3735 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3588 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3588 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 4-Gattis | Journal Page: 3566 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | 2-Hughes | Journal Page: 3566 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment amended | 3-Hughes | Journal Page: 3566 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Hughes | Journal Page: 3564 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3564 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |