Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2458 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3734 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#881 | Journal Page: 3734 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3734 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3734 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amended | 1-Coleman, Zerwas, J. Davis, and Naishtat | Journal Page: 3733 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3733 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3558 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#864 | Journal Page: 3558 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3558 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 9-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3557 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 7-Villarreal | Journal Page: 3556 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3556 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3549 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 733 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |