E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1077
|
Journal Page: 4412
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2592
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2592
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2592
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2592
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|