Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2972 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2972


 AN ACT
 relating to licensing of certain health facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 242.0021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 for purposes of this chapter, a controlling person of an
 institution or of a management company or other business entity
 described by Subsection (b)(1) that is a publicly traded
 corporation or is controlled by a publicly traded corporation means
 an officer or director of the corporation. The term does not
 include a shareholder or lender of the publicly traded corporation.
 SECTION 2. Section 242.039, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement an expedited
 inspection process that allows an applicant for a license or for a
 renewal of a license to obtain a life safety code and physical plant
 inspection not later than the 15th day after the date the request is
 made. The department may charge a fee to recover the cost of the
 expedited inspection.  The rules must permit the department to set
 different fee amounts based on the size and type of institution.
 SECTION 3. Section 247.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 for purposes of this chapter, a controlling person of an assisted
 living facility or of a management company or other business entity
 described by Subsection (b)(1) that is a publicly traded
 corporation or is controlled by a publicly traded corporation means
 an officer or director of the corporation. The term does not
 include a shareholder or lender of the publicly traded corporation.
 SECTION 4. Section 247.021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (d), (g), and (h) and adding
 Subsections (d-1), (d-2), and (d-3) to read as follows:
 (d) The department by rule shall establish procedures to
 issue a six-month provisional license to existing facilities with
 residents. The department may issue a provisional license [only]
 if:
 (1) the facility is in compliance with resident care
 standards;
 (2) the facility voluntarily discloses that the
 facility needs additional time to comply with life safety code and
 physical plant standards;
 (3) the disclosure is made in writing by certified
 mail to the department;
 (4) an investigation of the violation was not
 initiated and the violation was not independently detected by the
 department; and
 (5) the disclosure is made promptly after knowledge of
 the information disclosed is obtained by the facility.
 (d-1) A provisional license expires the earlier of:
 (1)  the 180th day after the effective date of the
 provisional license or the end of any extension period granted by
 the department, in the department's sole discretion; or
 (2)  the date a license is issued to the provisional
 license holder under Subsection (d-3).
 (d-2)  The department shall conduct a life safety code
 inspection of the facility as soon as reasonably possible after the
 department issues a provisional license.
 (d-3)  After conducting a life safety code inspection, the
 department shall issue a license under Section 247.023 to the
 provisional license holder if the facility passes the inspection
 and the applicant meets all requirements for a license. A license
 issued under this subsection has the same effective date as the
 provisional license.
 (g) The [Notwithstanding Subsection (f), the] department
 shall, upon submission of a written request by the applicant, [may]
 automatically issue a provisional license to a newly constructed
 facility if:
 (1) the facility is in compliance with resident care
 standards;
 (2) all local approvals have been obtained;
 (3) a complete license application is submitted within
 30 days of receipt of all local approvals; [and]
 (4) the license fee has been paid;
 (5)  before beginning construction, the license
 applicant submits working drawings and specifications to the
 department for review; and
 (6)  the department determines that the license
 applicant constructed another facility in this state that complies
 with the department's life safety code standards.
 (h) The [Notwithstanding Subsection (f), the] department
 may automatically issue a provisional license in the case of a
 corporate change of ownership of a facility.
 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.0211 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.0211.  EXPEDITED LIFE SAFETY CODE INSPECTION. (a)
 The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall adopt rules to implement an expedited inspection
 process that allows an applicant for an assisted living facility
 license or for a renewal of a license to obtain a life safety code
 and physical plant inspection not later than the 15th day after the
 date the request is made.
 (b)  The department may charge a fee to recover the cost of
 the expedited inspection.
 SECTION 6. Section 247.022, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  If the department conducts more than two life safety
 code inspections at the applicant's facility, the department may
 collect a fee in addition to the fee under Subsection (b) for the
 application for the license.
 SECTION 7. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.0262 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.0262.  REPORT ON LIFE SAFETY CODE SURVEYS. (a) The
 department shall annually report the number of life safety code
 surveys for an initial assisted living facility license with
 respect to which the department first visits the facility to
 conduct the survey more than 60 days after the date the applicant
 notifies the department that the applicant is ready for the initial
 survey.
 (b)  The department may report other data related to the
 timeliness of life safety code surveys or the processing time of
 license applications.
 (c)  The department may include the information described by
 Subsections (a) and (b) in any required annual regulatory report.
 SECTION 8. Section 247.032(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) In this section, "accreditation commission" means the
 Commission on Accreditation of Rehabilitation Facilities, [or] the
 Joint Commission on Accreditation of Healthcare Organizations, or
 another organization approved by the executive commissioner of the
 Health and Human Services Commission.
 SECTION 9. Sections 247.021(e) and (f), Health and Safety
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 10. Not later than June 1, 2010, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules to implement the expedited inspection processes as
 required by Sections 242.039(g) and 247.0211, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 11. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2972 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2972 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2972 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor