Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1721
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#353
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Paxton
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Paxton
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|