E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1721
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|