Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3057 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Castro (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3057
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 18, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use by a metropolitan rapid transit authority of the
 construction manager-at-risk method for the construction,
 rehabilitation, alteration, or repair of a facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 271.118(a-1), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1) In this section:
 (1) "Facility" ["facility"] means an improvement to
 real property.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" includes a metropolitan
 rapid transit authority under Chapter 451, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *