Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3065 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3065


 AN ACT
 relating to municipal registration of vacant buildings in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. REGISTRATION OF VACANT BUILDINGS
 Sec. 214.231. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Building" means any enclosed structure designed
 for use as a habitation or for a commercial use, including engaging
 in trade or manufacture.
 (2)  "Owner" means the person that owns the real
 property on which a building is situated, according to:
 (A)  the real property records of the county in
 which the property is located; or
 (B)  the records of the appraisal district in
 which the property is located.
 (3) "Unit" means an enclosed area designed:
 (A) for habitation by a single family; or
 (B)  for a commercial use, including engaging in
 trade or manufacture, by a tenant.
 Sec. 214.232.  PRESUMPTION OF VACANCY.  A building is
 presumed to be vacant under this subchapter if:
 (1)  all lawful residential, commercial, recreational,
 charitable, or construction activity at the building has ceased, or
 reasonably appears to have ceased, for more than 150 days; or
 (2)  the building contains more than three units, 75
 percent or more of which have not been used lawfully, or reasonably
 appear not to have been used lawfully, for more than 150 days.
 Sec. 214.233.  REGISTRATION.  (a)  A municipality located in
 a county with a population of 1.5 million or more may adopt an
 ordinance requiring owners of vacant buildings to register their
 buildings by filing a registration form with a designated municipal
 official.
 (b)  A municipality, in an ordinance adopted under this
 subchapter, may exempt certain classifications of buildings as
 determined reasonable and appropriate by the governing body of the
 municipality.
 Sec. 214.234.  FORM.  An ordinance adopted under this
 subchapter may require a designated municipal official to adopt a
 form for registration.  The form adopted may require the disclosure
 of information reasonably necessary for the municipality to
 minimize the threat to health, safety, and welfare that a vacant
 building may present to the public.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3065 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3065 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3065 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3065 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3065 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor