E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 1/1/10
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4423
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1415
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5335
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5131
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|