E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5928
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1533
|
Journal Page: 5929
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5928
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|