E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1078
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2525
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2525
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#614
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 6
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
14-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
13-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
13-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
13-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 2508
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#565
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
12-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
7-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
10-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
9-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|