Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3129 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 3129
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3129 By: Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain consumer transactions
 involving plumbing, air conditioning, and electrical services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 1301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.004.  NONAPPLICABILITY OF LAW GOVERNING
 CANCELLATION OF CERTAIN TRANSACTIONS.  Except as otherwise provided
 by this section, Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code, does not
 apply to a good or service provided by a license holder under this
 chapter if the transaction involving the good or service is
 initiated by the consumer.  Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code,
 does apply to a transaction that involves a breach of express
 warranty or a negligent installation in violation of a building
 code applicable to the good or service sold to the consumer.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 1302, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1302.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1302.003.  NONAPPLICABILITY OF LAW GOVERNING
 CANCELLATION OF CERTAIN TRANSACTIONS.  Except as otherwise provided
 by this section, Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code, does not
 apply to a good or service provided by a license holder under this
 chapter if the transaction involving the good or service is
 initiated by the consumer.  Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code,
 does apply to a transaction that involves a breach of express
 warranty or a negligent installation in violation of a building
 code applicable to the good or service sold to the consumer.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 1305, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1305.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1305.004.  NONAPPLICABILITY OF LAW GOVERNING
 CANCELLATION OF CERTAIN TRANSACTIONS.  Except as otherwise provided
 by this section, Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code, does not
 apply to a good or service provided by a license holder under this
 chapter if the transaction involving the good or service is
 initiated by the consumer.  Chapter 601, Business & Commerce Code,
 does apply to a transaction that involves a breach of express
 warranty or a negligent installation in violation of a building
 code applicable to the good or service sold to the consumer.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *