Senate | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2398 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#859 | Journal Page: 3516 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3516 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3516 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3433 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3433 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 11/20/2008 | Filed |