E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4742
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4743
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1142
|
Journal Page: 4743
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4742
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#568
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Berman
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|