House | 05/14/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3666 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1717 | Journal Page: 3665 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |