Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3184
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Anderson
|
Journal Page: 3184
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3184
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 744
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 744
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|