Senate | 05/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2144 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#620 | Journal Page: 2692 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2692 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2692 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2514 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |