Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3221 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3221


 AN ACT
 relating to required notification before automatic premium
 payments may be increased.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 550.002, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to
 read as follows:
 (b) An insurer receiving automatic premium payments through
 withdrawal of funds from a person's account, including an escrow
 account, as authorized by that person to pay premiums on insurance
 coverage provided through that insurer, may not increase the amount
 of funds to be withdrawn from the account to pay premiums on that
 coverage unless[:
 [(1)] the insurer, not later than the 30th day before
 the effective date of the increase in the premium payment amount,
 notifies the person of the increase by mailing a notice through the
 United States Postal Service.
 (b-1)  The notice must include the insurer's toll-free
 telephone number, mailing address, and electronic mail address, if
 applicable, through which the [and provides the] person [a postage
 prepaid form that] may [be used to] object to the increase described
 by Subsection (b). An objection made by the policyholder through a
 telephone call, mail, or electronic mail constitutes a valid
 objection for purposes of this section.
 (b-2)  The insurer may increase the amount of funds to be
 withdrawn from the account only if[; and
 [(2) neither] the insurer does not receive a valid
 [nor the financial institution receives written] objection to the
 increase on or before the fifth day before the date on which the
 increase is scheduled to take [takes] effect.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3221 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3221 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3221 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3221 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3221 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor