Senate | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2458 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3693 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3693 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |