House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3525 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3525 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3427 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3427 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 9 and Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3414 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 5-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3413 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 4-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3412 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3403 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 749 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 749 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |