Senate | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2398 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3513 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#855 | Journal Page: 3513 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3513 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3513 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3430 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3428 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 1-Gattis | Journal Page: 3428 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3428 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 10:30 PM | Journal Page: 3422 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32 | Journal Page: 3422 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3422 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |