1 | 1 | | 81R2339 UM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Kolkhorst H.B. No. 3300 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission |
---|
8 | 8 | | systems under the state Medicaid program. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 531.02411, Government Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 11 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 531.02411. STREAMLINING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCESSES. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (a) The commission shall make every effort using the |
---|
14 | 14 | | commission's existing resources to reduce the paperwork and other |
---|
15 | 15 | | administrative burdens placed on Medicaid recipients and providers |
---|
16 | 16 | | and other participants in the Medicaid program and shall use |
---|
17 | 17 | | technology and efficient business practices to decrease those |
---|
18 | 18 | | burdens. In addition, the commission shall make every effort to |
---|
19 | 19 | | improve the business practices associated with the administration |
---|
20 | 20 | | of the Medicaid program by any method the commission determines is |
---|
21 | 21 | | cost-effective, including: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) expanding the utilization of the electronic claims |
---|
23 | 23 | | payment system; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) developing an Internet portal system for prior |
---|
25 | 25 | | authorization requests; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (3) encouraging Medicaid providers to submit their |
---|
27 | 27 | | program participation applications electronically; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (4) ensuring that the Medicaid provider application is |
---|
29 | 29 | | easy to locate on the Internet so that providers may conveniently |
---|
30 | 30 | | apply to the program; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (5) working with federal partners to take advantage of |
---|
32 | 32 | | every opportunity to maximize additional federal funding for |
---|
33 | 33 | | technology in the Medicaid program; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (6) encouraging the increased use of medical |
---|
35 | 35 | | technology by providers, including increasing their use of: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (A) electronic communications between patients |
---|
37 | 37 | | and their physicians or other health care providers; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (B) electronic prescribing tools that provide |
---|
39 | 39 | | up-to-date payer formulary information at the time a physician or |
---|
40 | 40 | | other health care practitioner writes a prescription and that |
---|
41 | 41 | | support the electronic transmission of a prescription; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (C) ambulatory computerized order entry systems |
---|
43 | 43 | | that facilitate physician and other health care practitioner orders |
---|
44 | 44 | | at the point of care for medications and laboratory and |
---|
45 | 45 | | radiological tests; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (D) inpatient computerized order entry systems |
---|
47 | 47 | | to reduce errors, improve health care quality, and lower costs in a |
---|
48 | 48 | | hospital setting; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (E) regional data-sharing to coordinate patient |
---|
50 | 50 | | care across a community for patients who are treated by multiple |
---|
51 | 51 | | providers; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (F) electronic intensive care unit technology to |
---|
53 | 53 | | allow physicians to fully monitor hospital patients remotely. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (b) The commission shall develop and implement a plan |
---|
55 | 55 | | designed to encourage the increased use by Medicaid providers of |
---|
56 | 56 | | the medical technology described by Subsection (a)(6)(B). The plan |
---|
57 | 57 | | must include a goal of achieving by September 1, 2014, a specified |
---|
58 | 58 | | percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by |
---|
59 | 59 | | Medicaid providers. Not later than January 1, 2010, the commission |
---|
60 | 60 | | shall submit a report to the legislature describing the plan |
---|
61 | 61 | | developed by the commission in accordance with this subsection. |
---|
62 | 62 | | Not later than January 1, 2011, and January 1, 2013, the commission |
---|
63 | 63 | | shall submit a report to the legislature regarding the |
---|
64 | 64 | | implementation and results of the plan. This subsection expires |
---|
65 | 65 | | September 1, 2014. |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
67 | 67 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
68 | 68 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
69 | 69 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
70 | 70 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
71 | 71 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
73 | 73 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
74 | 74 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
75 | 75 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
76 | 76 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|