House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3694 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1271 | Journal Page: 3694 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |