House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |