Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3345 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farabee H.B. No. 3345


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 Relating to this state's goal for energy efficiency
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (d), and adding Subsection (h)
 to read as follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2) electric utilities will assist in building an
 infrastructure of trained and qualified energy services providers,
 allowing and encouraging the participation of retail electric
 providers in service delivery, that will ensure that all customers,
 in all customer classes, will have a choice of and access to energy
 efficiency alternatives and other choices from the market,
 including demand-side renewable energy systems, that allow each
 customer to reduce energy consumption, peak demand or energy costs;
 (3) each electric utility will annually provide,
 through a cost-effective portfolio of market-based standard offer
 programs or limited, targeted, market-transformation programs,
 incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and
 competitive energy service providers to acquire additional
 [cost-effective] energy efficiency for [residential and
 commercial] customers, other customers at transmission-level
 industrial facilities, equivalent to at least:
 (A) one-half of one [10] percent of the electric
 utility's peak [annual growth in] demand, not including demand from
 transmission-level industrial facilities, [of residential and
 commercial customers] by January 1, 2012 [December 31, 2007]; and
 (B) one [15] percent of the electric utility's
 peak [annual growth in] demand, not including demand from
 transmission-level industrial facilities, [of residential and
 commercial customers] by January 1, 2015 [December 31, 2008;
 provided that the electric utility's program expenditures for 2008
 funding may not be greater than 75 percent above the utility's
 program budget for 2007 for residential and commercial customers,
 as included in the April 1, 2006, filing; and
 [(C)     20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing];
 (4)  as a component of its portfolio of programs, each
 utility will provide incentives sufficient to facilitate the
 acquisition of demand-side renewable energy systems that shall
 produce the utility's load-proportionate share of 200 megawatts of
 electricity or avoided electric consumption, by January 1, 2015, as
 required by Subsection (b)(7);
 (5) [(4)] each electric utility in the ERCOT region
 shall create specific programs at a scale sufficient to [use its
 best efforts to encourage and] facilitate the involvement of the
 region's retail electric providers in the mass marketing and
 widespread delivery of efficiency programs and programs for
 demand-side renewable energy systems [demand response programs]
 under this section;
 (6) [(5)] retail electric providers in the ERCOT
 region, and electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall
 provide customers with energy efficiency educational materials;
 and.
 (7) [(6)] notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 (b) The commission shall provide oversight and adopt rules
 and procedures to ensure that the utilities can achieve the goal of
 this section, including:
 (1) establishing an energy efficiency cost recovery
 factor for ensuring timely and reasonable cost recovery for utility
 expenditures made to satisfy the goal of this section;
 (2) establishing an incentive under Section 36.204,
 sufficient to mitigate the effect of lost revenue associated with
 the success of efficiency programs required by this section, to
 reward utilities administering programs under this section that
 exceed the minimum goals established by this section;
 (3) providing a utility that is unable to establish an
 energy efficiency cost recovery factor in a timely manner due to a
 rate freeze with a mechanism to enable the utility to:
 (A) defer the costs of complying with this
 section; and
 (B) recover the deferred costs through an energy
 efficiency cost recovery factor on the expiration of the rate
 freeze period;
 (4) ensuring the costs associated with programs
 provided under this section are borne by the customer classes that
 receive the services under the programs; [and]
 (5) ensuring the program rules encourage the value of
 the incentives to be passed on to the end-use customer;
 (6)  ensuring that programs operate at a scale
 sufficient to:
 (A) reduce the rate of free ridership;
 (B)  ensure that all eligible customers have
 access to the programs; and
 (C)  allow retail electric providers and
 competitive energy service providers to mass market and deliver the
 programs to all eligible customers;
 (7)  establishing a statewide market transformation
 program to facilitate the use of demand-side renewable energy
 systems in supplying or reducing demand equivalent to not less
 than:
 (A)  50 megawatts of electricity by January 1,
 2012; and
 (B)  200 megawatts of electricity by January 1,
 2015; and
 (8)  ensuring that programs under this section lead to
 a significant and continuing reduction in demand or energy
 consumption, or costs, by using a ten-year standard measure life as
 the basis for calculating the contribution of either particular
 measures or programs toward achievement of the goals of this
 section.
 (d) The commission shall establish a procedure for
 reviewing and evaluating market-transformation program options
 described by this section [subsection] and other options. A market
 transformation program that is launched as a pilot program shall be
 continued for more than three years only if the commission
 determines that the pilot program is an appropriate means of
 addressing special market barriers that prevent or inhibit the
 measure or behavior addressed by the pilot program from being
 delivered or adopted through normal market channels, under the
 electric utility's standard offer programs [In evaluating program
 options, the commission may consider the ability of a program
 option to reduce costs to customers through reduced demand, energy
 savings, and relief of congestion.    Utilities may choose to
 implement any program option approved by the commission after its
 evaluation in order to satisfy the goal in Subsection (a),
 including:
 (1) energy-smart schools;
 (2) appliance retirement and recycling;
 (3) air conditioning system tune-ups;
 (4)     the use of trees or other landscaping for energy
 efficiency;
 (5)     customer energy management and demand response
 programs;
 (6)     high performance residential and commercial
 buildings that will achieve the levels of energy efficiency
 sufficient to qualify those buildings for federal tax incentives;
 (7)     programs for customers who rent or lease their
 residence or commercial space;
 (8)     programs providing energy monitoring equipment to
 customers that enable a customer to better understand the amount,
 price, and time of the customer's energy use;
 (9)     energy audit programs for owners and other
 residents of single family or multifamily residences and for small
 commercial customers;
 (10) net-zero energy new home programs;
 (11)     programs for solar thermal,  [or] solar electric
 programs,
 (12)     programs for using windows and other glazing
 systems, glass doors, and skylights in residential and commercial
 buildings that reduce solar gain by at least 30 percent from the
 level established for the federal Energy Star windows program].
 (h)  In this section, "demand-side renewable energy system"
 means a system that:
 (1)  uses distributed renewable generation, as defined
 by Section 39.916; or
 (2)  reduces the need for energy consumption by using a
 renewable energy technology or natural mechanism of the
 environment, including a geothermal heat pump or solar water
 heater.
 SECTION 2. Section 39.905(b-2), Utilities Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.