E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4752
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1146
|
Journal Page: 4753
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4752
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1881
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|