E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4423
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5433
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1442
|
Journal Page: 5433
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5433
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1881
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|