House | 05/14/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3524 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1011 | Journal Page: 3519 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 3248 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Postponed | 5/12/09 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 3078 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3078 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2727 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2727 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 774 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 774 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |