House | 04/24/2009 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 775 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 775 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |