E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5201 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 3166 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 2757 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 2757 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2313 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3216 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3193 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3193 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |