Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3433 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3433


 AN ACT
 relating to the extended registration of a commercial fleet of
 motor vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 502.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Commercial fleet" means a group of at least 25
 nonapportioned motor vehicles owned by a corporation, limited or
 general partnership, limited liability company, or other business
 entity and used for the business purposes of that entity.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.0023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0023.  EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF COMMERCIAL FLEET
 MOTOR VEHICLES.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 502.158(c), the
 department shall develop and implement a system of registration to
 allow an owner of a commercial fleet to register the motor vehicles
 in the commercial fleet for an extended registration period of not
 less than one year or more than eight years.  The owner may select
 the number of years for registration under this section within that
 range and register the commercial fleet for that period.  Payment
 for all registration fees for the entire registration period
 selected is due at the time of registration.
 (b)  A system of extended registration under this section
 must allow the owner of a commercial fleet to register:
 (1)  an entire commercial fleet in the county of the
 owner's residence or principal place of business; or
 (2)  the motor vehicles in a commercial fleet that are
 operated most regularly in the same county.
 (c)  In addition to the registration fees prescribed by
 Subchapter D, an owner registering a commercial fleet under this
 section shall pay:
 (1)  an annual commercial fleet registration fee of $10
 per motor vehicle in the fleet; and
 (2)  except as provided by Subsection (e), a one-time
 license plate manufacturing fee of $1.50 for each fleet motor
 vehicle license plate.
 (d) A license plate issued under this section:
 (1)  may, on request of the owner, include the name or
 logo of the business entity that owns the vehicle;
 (2)  must include the expiration date of the
 registration period; and
 (3)  does not require an annual registration insignia
 to be valid.
 (e)  In addition to all other applicable registration fees,
 an owner registering a commercial fleet under this section shall
 pay a one-time license plate manufacturing fee of $8 for each set of
 plates issued that includes on the legend the name or logo of the
 business entity that owns the vehicle instead of the fee imposed by
 Subsection (c)(2).
 (f)  If a motor vehicle registered under this section has a
 gross weight in excess of 10,000 pounds, the department shall also
 issue a registration card for the vehicle that is valid for the
 selected registration period.
 (g)  The department shall adopt rules to implement this
 section, including rules on suspension from the commercial fleet
 program for failure to comply with this section or rules adopted
 under this section.
 (h)  The department and the counties in their budgeting
 processes shall consider any temporary increases and resulting
 decreases in revenue that will result from the use of the process
 provided under this section.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 501.0234,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) This section does not apply to a motor vehicle:
 (1) that has been declared a total loss by an insurance
 company in the settlement or adjustment of a claim;
 (2) for which the certificate of title has been
 surrendered in exchange for:
 (A) a salvage vehicle title issued under this
 chapter;
 (B) a nonrepairable vehicle title issued under
 this chapter;
 (C) a certificate of authority issued under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 683; or
 (D) an ownership document issued by another state
 that is comparable to a document described by Paragraphs (A)-(C);
 [or]
 (3) with a gross weight in excess of 11,000 pounds; or
 (4)  purchased by a commercial fleet buyer who is a
 full-service deputy under Section 502.114 and who utilizes the
 dealer title application process developed to provide a method to
 submit title transactions to the county in which the commercial
 fleet buyer is a full-service deputy.
 SECTION 4. Section 502.0022, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5. The Texas Department of Transportation shall
 adopt the rules and establish the system required under Section
 502.0023, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3433 was passed by the House on May 8,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3433 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3433 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor