E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#444
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2248
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/1/09 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|