Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3452 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3452


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Texas Armed Services
 Scholarship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter FF to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER FF. TEXAS ARMED SERVICES SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAM
 Sec. 61.9771.  SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAM; SCHOLARSHIP AMOUNT. (a)
 The board shall establish and administer, in accordance with this
 subchapter and board rules, the Texas Armed Services Scholarship
 Program under which the board provides an annual conditional
 scholarship to a student who meets the eligibility criteria
 prescribed by Section 61.9772 and is appointed to receive a
 scholarship.
 (b)  The amount of a scholarship under this subchapter in an
 academic year is the lesser of:
 (1) $15,000; or
 (2)  the amount available for each scholarship from
 appropriations that may be used for scholarships under this
 subchapter for that academic year.
 Sec. 61.9772.  ELIGIBILITY; NOMINATION AND SELECTION. (a)
 To receive an initial scholarship under this subchapter, a student
 must:
 (1)  be enrolled as a freshman in a public or private
 institution of higher education in this state;
 (2)  enroll in and be a member in good standing of a
 Reserve Officers' Training Corps (ROTC) program while enrolled in a
 public or private institution of higher education in this state;
 (3)  be appointed to receive a scholarship by the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, a state senator, or a state
 representative; and
 (4)  enter into an agreement with the board under
 Section 61.9773.
 (b)  In each year, the governor and the lieutenant governor
 may each appoint two students and each state senator and each state
 representative may appoint one student to receive an initial
 scholarship under this subchapter.
 (c)  For a student to continue to receive a scholarship
 awarded under this subchapter, the student must maintain
 satisfactory academic progress as determined by the institution in
 which the student is enrolled.
 Sec. 61.9773.  AGREEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (a)  To receive a
 scholarship under this subchapter, a student must enter into an
 agreement with the board as provided by this section.  The agreement
 must require the student to:
 (1) complete four years of ROTC training;
 (2)  graduate not later than five years after the date
 the student first enrolls in a public or private institution of
 higher education in this state;
 (3) after graduation, enter into:
 (A)  a four-year commitment to be a member of the
 Texas Army or Air Force National Guard; or
 (B)  a contract to serve as a commissioned officer
 in any branch of the armed services of the United States;
 (4)  meet the physical examination requirements and all
 other prescreening requirements of the Texas Army or Air Force
 National Guard or the branch of the armed services with which the
 student enters into a contract; and
 (5) agree to repay the scholarship if the student:
 (A)  fails to maintain satisfactory academic
 progress;
 (B) withdraws from the scholarship program; or
 (C)  fails to fulfill a commitment or contract
 described by Subdivision (3).
 (b)  The board shall adopt rules to exempt a student from the
 repayment of a scholarship under an agreement entered into under
 this section if the student is unable to meet the obligations of the
 agreement solely as a result of physical inability.
 Sec. 61.9774.  RULES. (a) The board shall adopt rules as
 necessary for the administration of this subchapter, including
 rules regarding the eligibility criteria and the selection of
 scholarship recipients.
 (b)  The board by rule shall provide that any amount paid to a
 student by a branch of the armed services of the United States
 during an academic year for which the student receives a
 scholarship under this subchapter because the student is under a
 contract with that branch shall be deducted from the amount of the
 scholarship awarded to the student for that academic year.
 Sec. 61.9775.  LIMITATION ON SCHOLARSHIP. A person may not
 receive a scholarship under this subchapter after earning a
 cumulative total of 150 credit hours or after being awarded a
 baccalaureate degree, whichever occurs first.
 Sec. 61.9776.  FUNDING. The board shall administer this
 subchapter using available appropriations and gifts, grants, and
 donations made for the purposes of this subchapter.
 SECTION 2. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall award scholarships under Subchapter FF, Chapter 61, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, beginning with the 2010-2011 academic
 year. The coordinating board shall adopt the rules required by that
 subchapter as soon as practicable after this Act takes effect.
 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3452 was passed by the House on May
 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3452 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3452 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3452 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3452 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor