House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4595
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4595
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4065
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3524
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1881
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#417
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2175
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|