E
|
05/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
E
|
05/07/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|